Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:18-bk-12903
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2018
Terminated:Jun 12, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Feb 11, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Angel Medical Systems, Inc.
40 Christopher Way Ste 201
Eatontown, NJ 07724-3327
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. Angel Medical Systems wins approval for Chapter 11 bankruptcy plan (massdevice.com)
Submitted Fri 01/11/2019
2. Angel Medical Systems files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (massdevice.com)
Submitted Fri 01/04/2019
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, July 12, 2019
143 143 claims Claims Register Fri 07/12 2:06 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Stretto)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
142 142 claims Claims Register Fri 07/05 4:05 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Stretto)
Related: [-]