Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40067

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:19-bk-40072
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2019
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021

Debtor
Gigi's Cupcakes, LLC
PO Box 470159
Fort Worth, TX 76147-0159
Represented By
Michael A. McConnell
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee


1. Gigi's Cupcakes Files Chapter 11 Bankruptcy - Williamson Source (williamsonsource.com)
Submitted Fri 01/11/2019
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
210 210 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 11/02 3:10 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended Post Confirmation Ch 11 Report from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 11/9/2021. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 209 INCORRECT ENTRY. INCORRECT VERSION OF FORM USED. Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021 filed by Debtor Gigi's Cupcakes, LLC. (Ribaudo, Nancy) Modified on 11/2/2021 .
Monday, November 01, 2021
209 209 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 11/01 2:30 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021 filed by Debtor Gigi's Cupcakes, LLC. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-]