Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45003
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO)
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:18-cv-11486
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:03 PM EST
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
W. Michael Adams
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
Stacey Denise Williams
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
Scott R. Wolf
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By
Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info
Russell R. Dickson
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By
Thomas MacDougall Womack
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Richard Munice Crump
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Robert E. Dille
Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, Mccowan & Jarman
contact info
Shelley K. Napolitano
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
Franklin J. Foil
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
Defendant
Harco
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
Represented By
Sara E. Silva
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Maria R. Durant
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Safa W. Osmani
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Plaintiff
City of New Orleans
Represented By
Geraldine Broussard Baloney
contact info
Cesar Roberto Burgos
Burgos & Evans
contact info
Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Office Of City Counsel
contact info
Marcus Adam Green
Green Law Firm
contact info
Franklin G. Shaw
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Walter John Leger, III
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Fayard & Honeycutt
contact info
Walter John Leger, Jr.
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Jose Carlos Mendez
contact info
Miles L. Granderson
contact info
David Blayne Honeycutt
Fayard & Honeycutt
contact info
Abril Baloney Sutherland
Broussard Baloney
contact info
Brigid E. Collins
Law Office Of Frank G. Desalvo
contact info
Matthew S. Landry
Leger & Shaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:12 PM EDT
Monday, November 26, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-10477 J-15 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7254909) filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson.Attorney Kelly Juneau Rookard added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Juneau Rookard added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft).(Rookard, Kelly) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1: MDL Order,
Att: 2 Ex. 2: J&J Service Documents,
Att: 3 Ex. 3: State Court Pleadings,
Att: 4 Collateral Pleadings Notice,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
3 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. By the Clerk. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Rico Standing Order. By Clerk.(jrc) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
5 5 Response/Reply by New Orleans City to4 Rico Standing Order (Leger, Walter) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
6 6 Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation .(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (ajn). [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Related Case(s) by McKesson Corporation. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 03, 2018
10 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to all Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
11 11 ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/4/2018. (ajn) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time for All Manufacturing Defendants to Answer as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/4/2018. (ajn) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
13 13 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1447(b) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson re3 Order.(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Pleadings
Thursday, December 13, 2018
14 14 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 18*** MOTION to Remand to State Court by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2018.(Leger, Walter) Modified on 12/14/2018 (ajn). [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
15 15 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 19*** Request/Statement of Oral Argument by New Orleans City regarding14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Leger, Walter) Modified on 12/14/2018 (ajn). [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 NOTICE regarding oral argument on14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by New Orleans City. By Clerk.(jrc) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and15 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. ***Documents contain the incorrect case number. Please correct your caption. All future filings must reflect Civil Action # 18-11486 *** (ajn) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court with corrected caption by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2019.(Leger, Walter) Modified text on 12/18/2018 to correct submission date (ajn). [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
19 19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by New Orleans City regarding18 MOTION to Remand to State Court with corrected caption with corrected caption(Leger, Walter) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 14, 2018
20 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
21 21 NOTICE regarding oral argument one18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. By Clerk.(jrc) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. ***Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. The correct date is 1/9/2019. Clerk took corrective action.*** (ajn) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
23 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
25 25 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (lag) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
24 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/4/2019. (NEF: Judge Feldman)(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
26 26 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file sent.(lag) [Transferred from laed on 1/7/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal letter
27 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-11486. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]