Durant v. Maxar Technologies Inc. et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00124 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:0078j(b)ss - Stockholder Suit |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2019 2:39 AM MDT |
Defendant
Howard L. Lance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maxar Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biggs Porter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael B. Wirasekara, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Babulal Tarapara
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Kelly Svendsen
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Michael W Slaunwhite
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Jill Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Howard Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Oregon Laborers Employers Pension Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Rostyslav Nagornyi
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Miami Firefighters Relief and Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Gabriel Assioun
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Phillup G Newhope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Logan Durant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
207 | 207
order
Judgment
Wed 01/10 3:15 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 1/10/2024.206 Order on Motion (msmot,) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
206 | 206
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 01/09 3:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES 1. Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (ECF No.196 ) is GRANTED; 2. Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Award to Lead Plaintiff Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(4) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (ECF No.197 ) is GRANTED; 3. The Stipulation of Settlement (ECF No.178 ) is APPROVED; and 4. The Court SHALL RETAIN jurisdiction over the interpretation and implementation of the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/09/2024. (jrobe, ) |