Northern Cheyenne Tribe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45010 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Montana, 9:18-cv-00182 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:05 PM EST |
Defendant
ETHEX CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Northern Cheyenne Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:54 PM EDT |
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2215564 (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 1/17/2019.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |