Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45018 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New York Northern, 8:18-cv-01478 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:07 PM EST |
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Impax Generics
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1 through 100
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:22 PM EDT |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (meb) [Transferred from nynd on 1/22/2019.] | ||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |