Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:19-cr-00045
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2019
Last checked: Friday Feb 15, 2019 1:40 AM CST
Defendant
Adeluola Lipede (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew J. Lay
Office Of U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/15/2019 2:15 AM CST
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on 01/16/2019 to Judge John M. Bodenhausen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce as to Adeluola Lipede (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-6. (DJO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 7 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 01/16/2019 to Judge John M. Bodenhausen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce as to Adeluola Lipede (1): Former count 1-3 is now count 1r-3r. Former count 4-6 is now count 4r-6r.. (DJO)
Related: [-]