Chickasaw Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45066 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Eastern, 6:18-cv-00356 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chickasaw Nation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against all Defendants by Chickasaw Nation (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | ||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against all Defendants by Chickasaw Nation (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | ||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/30/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1218378 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion or Other Responsive Pleading (Docket Entry No.13 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond in this case by JANUARY 4, 2019. (adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | |
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Judge West are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 18-356-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Judge James H. Payne. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-356-JHP. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/14/2019.] | |
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |