Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Case #: 1:19-cv-20664
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseComputer Fraud and Abuse Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2019
Terminated:Mar 24, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2019 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Jacobo Adolpho Artieda Bercovici
Represented By
Joshua Lee Spoont
Sodhi Spoont PLLC
contact info
Defendant
LIV JETS, LLC
Represented By
Joshua Lee Spoont
Sodhi Spoont PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Lesa Armstrong
Represented By
Peter Theodore Mavrick
Peter T Mavrick PA
contact info
Defendant
Dawn Cerbone
Represented By
Bradley Paul Rothman
Weldon & Rothman, Pl
contact info
Defendant
Cameron Spanfelner
Defendant
Uniko Health, LLC
Represented By
Joshua Lee Spoont
Sodhi Spoont PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Reva Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By
Erica Gomer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Andrew Paul Gold
Akerman Senterfitt
contact info
Plaintiff
Reva Inc.
Represented By
Erica Gomer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Andrew Paul Gold
Akerman Senterfitt
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 110 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees; 111 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
GPO Jan 27 2021
ails. (drz)ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Bill of Costs; Adopting 123 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs are hereby awarded $52,943.50 in attorneys fees and $65.00 in taxable costs, for a total award of $53,008.50 against Defendant Spanfelner. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full det

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
126 126 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Bill of Costs Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 01/27 1:06 PM
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting in part and denying in part110 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part111 Motion for Bill of Costs; Adopting123 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs are hereby awarded $52,943.50 in attorneys fees and $65.00 in taxable costs, for a total award of $53,008.50 against Defendant Spanfelner. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
125 125 respoth Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 01/26 4:53 PM
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to123 Report and Recommendations of Cameron Spanfelner by Reva Acquisition, Inc., Reva Inc.. (Gomer, Erica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
124 124 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendations Fri 01/22 12:43 PM
OBJECTIONS to123 Report and Recommendations by Cameron Spanfelner. (wc)
Related: [-]