Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45086
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Case in other court:Alabama Middle, 2:19-cv-00100
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:13 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Autauga County, Alabama
Represented By
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jeffrey Donald Price
Beasley Allen
contact info
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Kyle Crosby Shirley
Mcdowell Faulk & Shirley
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:46 PM EDT
Monday, February 04, 2019
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Autauga County, Alabama. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc.1 for pdf.) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 153 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052280.), filed by Autauga County, Alabama.(dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
2 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Autauga County, Alabama. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and returned to counsel for foreign service. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued; summons,1 complaint, and2 corporate disclosure mailed CMRRR to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
5 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Kelly Webster for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Laura McHaney for Noramco, Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Laura McHaney for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
10 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by William Lolley for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 3/4/2019. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Julie Buckern for Cephalon, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
15 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
16 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Curtis S. (name illegible) for Actavis, LLC served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons stamped by CT Corporation for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons stamped by CT Corporation for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
20 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons stamped by CT Corporation for Mallinckrodt LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
Case transferred electronically to USDC, Northern District of Ohio via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
21 21 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 2/21/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 2/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
22 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 2:19-cv-00100. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]