Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds et al v. DR Hauling Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:19-cv-01996 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.: Delinquent Contributions |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2019 4:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
DR Hauling Inc.
604 5th Avenue
Pelham, NY 10803 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Domenic Ragno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/01 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) DR Hauling Inc., Domenic Ragno. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/01 10:03 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) DR Hauling Inc., Domenic Ragno pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Kornfeld, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dt) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/01 10:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Daniel Kornfeld. RE-FILE Document No. 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/12 4:07 PM
NOTICE of To Extend Time to Answer re:15 Notice (Other),. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/29 10:01 AM
NOTICE of To Extend Time To Answer re:7 Summons Issued,13 Stipulation and Order,,, Set Deadlines,,10 Summons Returned Executed,8 Summons Issued. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/14 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Mattesi on behalf of DR Hauling Inc., Domenic Ragno. (Mattesi, Anthony) |
|
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 05/14 3:52 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that Defendants DR Hauling Inc. and Domenic Ragno's time to submit their answer to the Complaint (Docket No. l] is extended to May 31, 2019. However, Defendants' time to respond or otherwise file a motion pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is not extended by this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. DR Hauling Inc. answer due 5/31/2019; Domenic Ragno answer due 5/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/14/2019) (kv) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/13 12:51 PM
NOTICE of To Extend Time To Answer re:10 Summons Returned Executed,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/15 3:15 PM
ORDER terminating9 Motion. ORDERED, that Plaintiffs are authorized to serve the summons and complaint upon Defendant Domenic Ragno using one of the following methods: by mailing the summons and complaint to Defendant Domenic Ragno at that business address of 604 5th Avenue, Pelham, New York, by first class mail in an envelope bearing the legend "PERSONAL AND CONFIDENTIAL" and not indicating on the outside thereof, by return address or otherwise, that the communication is from an attorney or concerns an action against Defendant Domenic Ragno. (Must obtain a certificate of mailing). As further set forth in this Order. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 9). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/15/2019) (cf) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/12 3:37 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. DR Hauling Inc. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky an Agent of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds; Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/10 3:35 PM
MOTION Alter Method of Service re:8 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, . Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456.(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/06 11:30 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Domenic Ragno. (dnh) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/06 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR Hauling Inc.. (dnh) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/05 10:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Domenic Ragno, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/05 10:26 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Domenic Ragna, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/05 10:24 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR Hauling Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 03/05 10:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds; Domenic Ragno. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 03/05 10:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 03/05 10:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 03/05 10:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/05 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each Request for Issuance of Summons must be filed separately OR one PDF may be used with a 'rider' attached if necessary;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 03/04 11:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/04 11:36 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR Hauling Inc. and Domenic Ragno, Individually, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension Fund, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Saul Sing, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456.(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/04 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against DR Hauling Inc., Domenic Ragno, Individually. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16435595)Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension Fund, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Saul Sing, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456.(Kornfeld, Daniel) |