New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alison J Nathan
Case #: 1:12-cv-01244
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2012
Terminated:Mar 31, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2016 12:32 PM EST
Defendant
Philip A. Falcone
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Mark Adam Kirsch
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Mitchell Alan Karlan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Leslie Gordon
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harbinger Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Mark Adam Kirsch
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Mitchell Alan Karlan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Leslie Gordon
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Special Situations Offshore GP, L.L.C.
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners GP, L.L.C.
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners LLC
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Mark Adam Kirsch
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Mitchell Alan Karlan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Leslie Gordon
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Special Situations GP, L.L.C.
Represented By
Leslie Gordon Fagen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Leffell
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Steven Craig Herzog
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ny)
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Special Situations Offshore Fund LP
Represented By
Isaac Berkman Zaur
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Gregory A. Clarick
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Nicole L. Gueron
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Special Situation Fund L.P.
Represented By
Isaac Berkman Zaur
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Gregory A. Clarick
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Nicole L. Gueron
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Fund I, L.P.
Represented By
Isaac Berkman Zaur
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Gregory A. Clarick
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Nicole L. Gueron
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Edward M. Armfield Sr. Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Zamansky & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Zamansky
Zamansky & Associates LLC
contact info
Steven E. Fineman
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Dugald Galbraith
The Law Office Of Kevin Galbraith
contact info
Nicholas R. Diamand
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michele S. Carino
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lili Schad
Represented By
David A. Straite
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP
contact info
Daniel Charles Girard
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Stewarts Law Us LLP
contact info
Nicholas R. Diamand
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michele S. Carino
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Zamansky & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Zamansky
Zamansky & Associates LLC
contact info
Amanda Marjorie Steiner
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Christina H. C. Sharp
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Steven E. Fineman
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Dugald Galbraith
The Law Office Of Kevin Galbraith
contact info
Jonathan K. Levine
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Randall Lang
Represented By
Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Zamansky & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Zamansky
Zamansky & Associates LLC
contact info
Steven E. Fineman
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Dugald Galbraith
The Law Office Of Kevin Galbraith
contact info
Nicholas R. Diamand
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michele S. Carino
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Klein Family Partnership L.P.
Represented By
Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Zamansky & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Zamansky
Zamansky & Associates LLC
contact info
Steven E. Fineman
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Dugald Galbraith
The Law Office Of Kevin Galbraith
contact info
Nicholas R. Diamand
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michele S. Carino
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Anil Bhardwaj
Represented By
Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Zamansky & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
David A. Straite
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP
contact info
Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Stewarts Law Us LLP
contact info
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Zamansky
Zamansky & Associates LLC
contact info
Steven E. Fineman
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Dugald Galbraith
The Law Office Of Kevin Galbraith
contact info
Nicholas R. Diamand
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michele S. Carino
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Harbert Fund Advisors, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2012
Represented By
Rachel Mead Cherington
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Pamela H. Jarvis
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Gregory P. Joseph
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Defendant
Harbert Management Corp.
Terminated: 11/20/2013
Represented By
Rachel Mead Cherington
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Pamela H. Jarvis
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Gregory P. Joseph
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Master Fund I, Ltd.
Terminated: 12/02/2013
Represented By
Nina Minard Beattie
Brune Law P.C.
contact info
Jessica Renee Holloway
Brune & Richard LLP
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Offshore Fund II, Ltd.
Terminated: 08/07/2012
Represented By
Nina Minard Beattie
Brune Law P.C.
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Offshore Fund I, Ltd.
Terminated: 12/02/2013
Represented By
Nina Minard Beattie
Brune Law P.C.
contact info
Jessica Renee Holloway
Brune & Richard LLP
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Harbinger Capital Partners Fund II, L.P.
Terminated: 08/07/2012
Represented By
Isaac Berkman Zaur
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
205 205 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 07/22 11:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to204 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lili Schad USCA Case Number 15-1429 ...that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/21/2015. (nd)
Related: [-]