Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45123
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-01594
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:15 PM EST
Defendant
All for Jen LLC
Defendant
B&B Drugs, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Lester Houghton, III
Gachassin Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas Gachassin, III
Gachassin Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Micah Collins Zeno
Gordon, Arata, Montgomery & Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
Dau Tran
Plaintiff
Caroline S. Newman
Represented By
Dennis P. Couvillion
contact info
Plaintiff
Maxwell A. Newman
Represented By
Dennis P. Couvillion
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, Louisiana, case number 2018-8229 E-16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7439912) filed by Purdue Pharma LP.Attorney Micah Collins Zeno added to party Purdue Pharma LP(pty:dft).(Zeno, Micah) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 21, 2019
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Simon, Paul) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
4 4 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
5 5 MOTION to Stay by Purdue Pharma LP. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/13/2019.(Simon, Paul) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
6 6 ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Purdue Pharma LP.(Simon, Paul) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, March 08, 2019
7 7 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (ajn) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file sent.(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 3/11/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Monday, March 11, 2019
9 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-01594. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]