Atkinson County, Georgia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45118 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Southern, 5:19-cv-00016 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:15 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
American Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
JM SMITH CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Atkinson County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
Terminated: 03/27/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2545914. (csr) Modified on 2/22/2019 (slt). [Transferred from gasd on 3/11/2019.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |