Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:19-cr-00158
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2019 3:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (4)
Represented By
Stephanie Lee Milliron
Milliron Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Fidel Garcia-Fontes (3)
Represented By
Walter E. Herman, III
Law Office Of W.E. "rusty" Herman
contact info
Defendant
Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Pecos
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Macario Portillo-Gonzalez (2)
Represented By
Elizabeth Rogers
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Lewis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/16/2019 3:17 AM CDT
Thursday, February 21, 2019
Arrest of Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Macario Portillo-Gonzalez. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Fidel Garcia-Fontes. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Estanislao Garcia-Fontes. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes held on 2/25/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) ( Detention Hearing set for 3/1/2019 09:30 AM in Alpine before Judge David B. Fannin,, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/1/2019 09:30 AM in Alpine before Judge David B. Fannin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (Court Reporter FTR.) (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Macario Portillo-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Fidel Garcia-Fontes. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Estanislao Garcia-Fontes. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARINGas to Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
13 13 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (Milliron, Stephanie) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Detention Hearing as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes held on 3/1/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Preliminary Hearing as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes held on 3/1/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to no bond as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to no bond as to Macario Portillo-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to no bond as to Fidel Garcia-Fontes. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:19-mj-00464-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Pecos Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Hecto r Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez, Fidel Garcia-Fontes, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (mc4)
Related: [-]
18 18 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Hector Manuel Portillo-Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Macario Portillo-Gonzalez (2) count(s) 1, 2, Fidel Garcia-Fontes (3) count(s) 1, 2, Estanislao Garcia-Fontes (4) count(s) 1, 2. (cv)
Related: [-] dacted Version