Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:19-ap-50180
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2019
Terminated:Mar 25, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Prime NDT Services, Inc.
4345 Independence Drive
Schnecksville, PA 18078
Represented By
Prime NDT Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
26933 Eckel Road
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Erin Edwards
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION. (related document(s)7) (GM)
GPO Feb 05 2020
MEMORANDUM ORDER (related document(s)85) (CAS)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
133 133 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/25 1:14 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceedings Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Edwards, Erin)
Related: [-]
132 132 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 03/25 10:34 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mielke, Allison)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/25 4:33 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50180 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
131 131 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/19 2:25 PM
ORDER AUTHORIZING THE FILING OF PORTIONS OF THEOBJECTION UNDER SEAL Related [+] Order Signed on 3/19/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 110
130 130 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/19 8:38 AM
ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY AND BETWEEN THE DEBTORS AND PRIME Related [+] Order Signed on 3/19/2020. (DRG)
Related: [-] 123 ,129
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
129 129 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 03/18 4:44 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019, Approving Settlement Agreement by and between the Debtors and Prime Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Edwards, Erin)
Related: [-]