Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45217
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2019
Case in other court:Arizona, 3:19-cv-08070
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:23 PM EST
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Defendant
Impax Generics
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Co Inc
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Incorporated
Plaintiff
County of Navajo
Represented By
Bradley William Carlyon
Navajo County Attorneys Office
contact info
Jason Stanley Moore
Navajo County Attorneys Office
contact info
David J. Ko
Keller Rohrback
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:49 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16639449 filed by Navajo, County of. (Kilgard, Ron)(DLC) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Navajo, County of. (Kilgard, Ron) (DLC) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16639449. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-8070 PCT-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP, SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutial Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85) Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio Re MDL-2804. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
7 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 3:19-cv-08070. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]