Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:William C Lee
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:19-cv-00138
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2019
Terminated:Oct 08, 2019
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2019 6:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Leaders Staffing
Represented By
J Blake Hike
Carson Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Rebecca Kleber
Carson Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mediator
Anthony Stites
Plaintiff
Eliseo Duran
Represented By
Christopher C Myers
Christopher C Myers & Associates
contact info
Lori W Jansen
Christopher C Myers & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Tue 10/08 8:28 AM
CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re16 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (lns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
16 16 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 10/03 3:32 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Leaders Staffing. (Hike, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 07/08 9:33 PM
ORDER: Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/11/2020. Counsel for all parties shall participate in at least one settlement conference prior to any future telephonic status and scheduling conference. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/8/2019. (lns)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
14 14 misc Certificate Fri 05/31 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE / Attorney Certification . (Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Thu 05/09 3:02 PM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Lori Janson. Atty Blake Hike and Nate Golm, President, appeared on behalf of Dft Leaders Staffing. The10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 4/10/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Jansen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Hike. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/30/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
12 12 misc Certificate Wed 05/08 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE /Attorney Certification . (Hike, J)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/08 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Eliseo Duran (Jansen, Lori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 05/02 12:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
9 9 misc Jury Demand Fri 04/26 3:16 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leaders Staffing. (Hike, J)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/26 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint /Leaders Staffing Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Leaders Staffing.(Hike, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J Blake Hike on behalf of All Defendants (Hike, J)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Thu 04/04 2:18 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Thu 04/04 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 11:15 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend.(mr)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/04 12:39 PM
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/03 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3854110.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D01-1901-CT-54, filed by Leaders Staffing LLC.(Kleber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/04 12:44 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re2 State Court Complaint Leaders Staffing answer due 4/26/19.. Signed by Judge, Allen County Superior Court on 3/14/19. (jld)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/04 12:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Leaders Staffing. (filed in State Court) (jld)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
2 2 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 04/04 12:40 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Leaders Staffing, filed by Eliseo Duran.(jld)
Related: [-]