Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-10653

Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Dana L Rasure
Case #: 4:19-bk-10658
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2019
Terminated:Apr 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Paul J Darby
Represented By
John E. Howland
Rosenstein, Fist & Ringold
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
224 South Boulder Avenue Suite 225
Tulsa, OK 74103


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Friday, April 08, 2022
24 24 court Final Decree. Case Closed. Fri 04/08 1:41 PM
FINAL DECREE. The estate of the above-named debtor has been fully administered. The case of the above-named debtor is closed. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure (ES)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Copy Fri 04/08 1:40 PM
Copy of Order Granting Receiver's Motion to Close Case with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c) (ES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
22 22 misc Creditor Request for Notices Thu 06/06 2:09 PM
Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Tradesmen Services, LLC.(eRQN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
21 21 order Generic Order Tue 04/16 2:32 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE to Attorneys for Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, L.L.C., Sierrita Gas Pipeline, L.L.C. and El Paso Natural Gas Company : An Order Granting Receiver's Motion for Joint Administration was entered on April 8, 2019 (Doc. 15) directing the joint administration of the Chapter 15 cases of (1) Innova Global Ltd., (2) Innova Global Operating Ltd., (3) Innova Global Limited Partnership, (4) 1938247 Alberta Ltd., (5) Innova Global Holdings Limited Partnership, (6) Innova Global Inc. (formerly AEM Emissions Management Inc., formerly ATCO Emissions Management Inc.), (7) Innova Global LLC (formerly AEM Noise Management LLC, formerly ATCO Noise Management LLC), and (8) Braden Manufacturing, L.L.C. (the "Order"). All new filings relative to any of the Debtors, except proofs of claim, shall be captioned as set forth on page 5 of the Order and filed in Case No. 19-10653 R . The docket in the Chapter 15 case of Innova Global Ltd., Case No. 19-10653 R should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Relief From Stay,20 Entry of Appearance
20 20 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/16 2:24 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Lyle R. Nelson on behalf of El Paso Natural Gas Company, Sierrita Gas Pipeline, L.L.C., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company L.L.C.. (Nelson, Lyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
19 19 crditcrd none Mon 04/15 3:33 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay 19-10658 R) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 4182835. Fee amount 181.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#18
18 18 motion Relief from Stay Mon 04/15 3:24 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay to Allow Termination of Contracts, and Notice of Opportunity for Hearing . Fee Amount $181 Notice of Opportunity for Hearing: Written Response or Objection due within 14 days. If no response or objection is timely filed, the Court may grant the requested relief without hearing or further notice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Lyle R. Nelson on behalf of El Paso Natural Gas Company, Sierrita Gas Pipeline, L.L.C., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company L.L.C.. (Nelson, Lyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, April 08, 2019
17 17 notice Notice Mon 04/08 4:00 PM
NOTICE: An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 15 cases of (1) Innova Global Ltd., (2) Innova Global Operating Ltd., (3) Innova Global Limited Partnership, (4) 1938247 Alberta Ltd., (5) Innova Global Holdings Limited Partnership, (6) Innova Global Inc. (formerly AEM Emissions Management Inc., formerly ATCO Emissions Management Inc.), (7) Innova Global LLC (formerly AEM Noise Management LLC, formerly ATCO Noise Management LLC), and (8) Braden Manufacturing, L.L.C.; the docket in the Chapter 15 case of Innova Global Ltd., Case No. 19-10653 R should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Related [+]. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
16 16 order Joint Administration Mon 04/08 3:07 PM
Order Granting Receiver's Motion For Joint Administration Related [+]. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, April 05, 2019
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/05 6:26 PM
Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure Related [+]. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 9 pgs order Order for Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/05 6:25 PM
Order Granting Receiver's Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Relief Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 1519 of the Bankruptcy Cod Related [+]. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] Related Doc #3
13 13 jrmin13 Hearing held; Fri 04/05 6:24 PM
MINUTE: Telephonic hearing held on Receiver's Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Relief Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1519 of the Bankruptcy Code. Application granted; order to be entered. Receiver's Emergency Motion for Joint Administration granted; order to be entered. Receiver's request for expedited hearing on Receiver's Petition for Recognition as Foreign Main Proceedings, or Alternatively as Foreign Nonmain Proceedings, Pursuant to Section 1515 and 1517 of the Bankruptcy Code and Related Relief granted; hearing to be held on April 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Order setting hearing to be entered Related [+]. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 3 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, 5 Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case,8 Motion for Joint Administration
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/05 2:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Admit Steve A. Peirce Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure. (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 7
11 11 court District Court Receipt Fri 04/05 1:38 PM
District Court Receipt #TOK043889; Amount $50.00; Attorney: Steve A. Peirce. Related [+]. (W, Sharon)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
10 10 misc Petition Fri 04/05 11:56 AM
Amended Petition. Related [+] Reason for filing amendment or correction: Debtor's Registered Office change . Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-] 1 Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 04/05 8:15 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate parents added to case:Innova Global Operating Ltd. Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
8 8 motion Joint Administration Thu 04/04 4:44 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 4:23 PM
Motion for Steve A. Peirce to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Setting Hearing Thu 04/04 4:12 PM
Order Setting Emergency Telephonic Hearing on 4/5/2019 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure Related [+]. (N, Brenda)
Related: [-] 3 Application for Temporary Restraining Order,4
5 5 TextOrderM Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case (Judge Michael) Thu 04/04 4:07 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING BANKRUPTCY CASE to Chief Judge Dana L. Rasure. The case number shall remain the same, except that the "M" following the case number shall be replaced by an "R" in future pleadings. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (B, Adam)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/04 3:07 PM
Application for Expedited Hearing and Recognition as Foreign Main Proceedings, or Alternatively as Foreign Nonmain Proceedings, Pursuant to Sections 1515 and 1517 of the United States Bankruptcy Code and Related Brief Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 04/04 12:41 PM
Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Relief Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 1519 of the Bankruptcy Code . Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receivership Order entered by the Court of Queen's Bench of Alberta in the Judicial Centre of Calgary, Canada
Att: 2 Exhibit App of ATB Financial in Canadian Proceeding seeking appointment of receiver
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Alex Corbett in support of App for Receiver
Att: 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Katie Doran in Support of App for Receiver
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Foreign Counsel
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of Foreign Representative
Att: 7 Exhibit Sec of State Searches
Att: 8 Exhibit Corporation Organization Chart
Att: 9 Exhibit FRCvP 65 Declaration of John E. Howland
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 04/04 9:51 AM
Receipt of Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 19-10658 [misc,petfp15a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 4177954. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Thu 04/04 9:50 AM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by John E. Howland on behalf of Paul J Darby. (Howland, John)
Related: [-]