New Jersey District Court
Judge:Joseph H Rodriguez
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:19-cv-09245
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2019
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2019 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
Represented By
ALEKSANDER P. POWIETRZYNSKI
Winston & Winston PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PAULA MEZZO
Represented By
CRAIG B. SANDERS
Barshay Sanders PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Tue 10/06 4:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/6/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/06 4:03 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 06/09 4:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by PAULA MEZZO. (SANDERS, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
11 11 order Order Tue 03/03 2:38 PM
TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED counsel's request to stay the April 1, 2020 initial conference [Doc. No. 10] is GRANTED. Counsel shall advise the Court when the Third Circuit decides the referenced appeals. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/3/20. (Schneider, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
10 10 misc Letter Thu 02/27 10:49 AM
Letter from MRS BPO, LLC re7 Order on Motion to Dismiss, QC - Incorrect Event Selected,9 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
9 9 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Thu 02/27 10:28 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/27/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 02/26 8:07 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter request for an initial conference8 filed by CRAIG B. SANDERS on 2/25/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. In the future, please submit letters using thee "Letter" event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
8 8 motion Hearing Tue 02/25 5:55 PM
MOTION for Hearing at Initial Case Management Conference by PAULA MEZZO. (SANDERS, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/11 2:09 PM
ORDER Dismissing without prejudice Defendant's4 Motion to Dismiss with the right to renew the motion within twenty days following a decision by the Third Circuit in Sentry Credit. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 2/11/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
6 6 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 06/10 12:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MRS BPO, LLC re4 MOTION to Dismiss (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 03, 2019
5 5 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 06/03 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PAULA MEZZO re4 MOTION to Dismiss (SANDERS, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 05/23 11:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by MRS BPO, LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2019(POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/23 2:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/06 10:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAULA MEZZO. MRS BPO, LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (SANDERS, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/04 11:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MRS BPO, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/04 8:28 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/04 11:11 AM
Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9552736) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Paula Mezzo.(SANDERS, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet