Windstream Holdings, Inc. et al v. Yadegarian et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-22312
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-22312
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:19-ap-08247 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Charlos Yadegarian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cindy Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Windstream Holdings, Inc.
4001 North Rodney Parham Road
Little Rock, AR 72212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EarthLink Holdings Corp.
4001 North Rodeny Parham Road
Little Rock, AR 72212 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/16 4:47 PM
Adversary Case 7:19-ap-8247 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
![]() DISMISSAL AGREEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 8023, of U.S. District Court Judge Cathy Seibel, signed on 10/20/2020 |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/26/19 At 10:23 AM RE: Motion To Approve / Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving The Debtors And Carlos Yadegarians Stipulation And Agreed Order To Partially Lift The Automatic Stay.; Motion To Approve /Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving The Stipulation And Agreed Order Regarding Complaint To Extend The Automatic Stay Or, In The Alternative, To Obtain An Injunction Or Other Equitable Relief [Docket No. 1] . Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/27/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/3/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/27/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/27/2020. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 10/8/2019. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Notice and Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order to Adjourn Adversary Proceeding Indefinitely filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Statement / Notice of Filing of Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order to Adjourn Adversary Proceeding Indefinitely filed by Stephen Hessler on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Hessler, Stephen) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Transmittal of Record of Appeal. All documents have been filed with the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically under Civil Case Number 19-cv-6744 assigned to the Honorable Cathy Seibel. Check the District Court Docket Sheet for the Briefing Schedule. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 8/23/2019 to Partially Lift the Automatic Stay. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 8/21/2019 Regarding Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, to Obtain an Injunction or Other Equitable Relief [Docket No. 1]. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Affidavit of Service re: 1) Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, to Obtain an Injunction or Other Equitable Relief [Docket No. 1] filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class. (Etkin, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Statement Designation of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr. P. 8009(a) filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class. (Etkin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 7/29/2019 Regarding Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, to Obtain an Injunction or Other Equitable Relief (Docket No. 1). (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/17/19 At 10:15 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference.; Motion To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Motion Of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff To Dismiss Adversary Complaint . Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/22/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/31/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/26/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/22/2019. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1906744 Judge Cathy Seibel (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class. (Etkin, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Appeal re: Order Denying The Motion Of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff To Dismiss Adversary Complaint And Extending The Automatic Stay To Non-Debtor Defendants In The Securities Class Action filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class.(Etkin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 07/17 3:21 PM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal([LINK 19-08247 rdd] ) [appeal,97] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13318984. Fee amount 298.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, to Obtain an Injunction or Other Equitable Relief [Docket No. 1] filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay Or, in the Alternative, to Obtain an Injunction or Other Equitable Relief [Docket No. 1] filed by Stephen Hessler on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 7/19/2019,. (Hessler, Stephen) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Order signed on 7/3/2019 Denying the Motion of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff to Dismiss Adversary Complaint and Extending the Automatic Stay to Non-Debtor Defendants in the Securities Class Action . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Debtors' and Carlos Yadegarian's Stipulation and Agreed Order to Partially Lift the Automatic Stay filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Debtors' and Carlos Yadegarian's Stipulation and Agreed Order to Partially Lift the Automatic Stay filed by Stephen Hessler on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 7/19/2019,. (Hessler, Stephen) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Response to Motion of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service filed by Albert Y. Chang on behalf of Charlos Yadegarian. (Chang, Albert) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Albert Y. Chang on behalf of Charlos Yadegarian. with hearing to be held on 8/20/2019 (check with court for location) Responses due by 8/13/2019, (Chang, Albert) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Response to Motion / Debtors' Response to Motion of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Stephen Hessler on behalf of EarthLink Holdings Corp., Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Hessler, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class. (Etkin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Motion of Securities Class Action Lead Plaintiff to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Class Action Captioned As Robert Murray v Earthlink Holdings Corp. et al. and the Proposed Class. with hearing to be held on 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 6/14/2019, (Etkin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, In the Alternative, to Obtain Injunction or Other Equitable Relief filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. Answer due by 5/13/2019. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-08247 Complaint against Charlos Yadegarian, Robert Murray, Cindy Graham and Larry Graham (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Filed by Stephen Hessler on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc., EarthLink Holdings Corp.. (Hessler, Stephen) |