Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:17-op-45001
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2017
Case in other court:Northern District of Ohio, 17cv1872 Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, CV 17 884281
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:25 PM EST
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Represented By
Bruce A. Moore
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Gregory D. Brunton
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Daniel J. Hyzak
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Represented By
Bruce A. Moore
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Gregory D. Brunton
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Daniel J. Hyzak
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Jason J. Blake
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Brian M. Ercole
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami
contact info
J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Jason J. Blake
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Albert J. Lucas
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Brian M. Ercole
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami
contact info
J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Daniel J. Buckley
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cincinnati
contact info
R. Ryan Stoll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Daniel J. Buckley
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cincinnati
contact info
R. Ryan Stoll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Daniel J. Buckley
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cincinnati
contact info
R. Ryan Stoll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Represented By
O. Judson Scheaf, III
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Columbus
contact info
Jordan D. Rauch
Dickinson Wright - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
John Q. Lewis
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Vincent I. Holzhall
Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
John Q. Lewis
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
John Q. Lewis
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By
John Q. Lewis
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Perry Fine
Represented By
Bruce A. Moore
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Gregory D. Brunton
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Daniel J. Hyzak
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Sean O. Morris
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Los Angeles
contact info
Tera N. Coleman
Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland
contact info
Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - New York
contact info
Carole S. Rendon
Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Sean O. Morris
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Los Angeles
contact info
Tera N. Coleman
Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland
contact info
Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - New York
contact info
Carole S. Rendon
Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Jason J. Blake
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Albert J. Lucas
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Brian M. Ercole
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami
contact info
J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph F. Murray
Murray, Murphy, Moul & Basil
contact info
James B. Hadden
Murray, Murphy, Moul & Basil
contact info
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Represented By
Andrea B. Daloia
Thompson Hine - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Andrea B. Daloia
Thompson Hine - Cleveland
contact info
Stacey A. Greenwell
Invalid Address Thompson Hine - Cleveland
contact info
Jennifer G. Levy
Kirkland & Ellis - Washington
contact info
John R. Mitchell
Thompson Hine - Cleveland
contact info
Albert J. Lucas
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Timothy W. Knapp
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Donna M. Welch
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info
Martin L. Roth
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Jason J. Blake
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Albert J. Lucas
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Brian M. Ercole
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami
contact info
J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Steven A. Reed
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Jason J. Blake
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Albert J. Lucas
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus
contact info
Tinos Diamantatos
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago
contact info
Brian M. Ercole
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami
contact info
J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Parma
Represented By
Hunter J. Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
Patrick G. Warner
Leist Warner
contact info
Salvatore C. Badala
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Scott D. Simpkins
Climaco, Wilcox, Peca, Tarantino & Garofoli - Cleveland
contact info
Margaret M. Metzinger
Kadish, Hinkel & Weibel
contact info
John R. Climaco
Climaco, Wilcox, Peca, Tarantino & Garofoli - Cleveland
contact info
D. Scott Kalish
Kalish Law
contact info
Joseph L. Ciaccio
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Paul J. Napoli
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
Michael W. Czack
Czack Law Firm
contact info
Shayna Erin Sacks
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
David M. Cuppage
Mccarthy, Lebit, Crystal & Liffman
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:48 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
1 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 17 884281 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8314264. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-cv-1639 . Filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Coleman, Tera) Modified text on 9/7/2017 (S,SR).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 State Court filings,
Att: 4 614 F.Supp.2d 868,
Att: 5 2017 WL 2843614,
Att: 6 2017 WL 3317300
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coleman, Tera)
Related: [-]