Jones Energy, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-32112
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-32112
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-bk-32111 |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Jones Energy, LLC
807 Las Cimas Pkwy Ste 350
Austin, TX 78746-6193 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
trustee
Remark (batch)
Mon 01/22 2:30 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
Document
Mon 02/03 8:23 AM
Exhibit: (ClaudiaGutierrez) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 09/30 4:58 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (emiller) |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/14 4:23 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (aalo) |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Thu 05/09 1:44 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 2 claim paid in full (Crawford, Janaha) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
utility
Reopen Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/14 4:50 PM
Bankruptcy Case Reopened (aalo) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/18 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/18 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/15 4:25 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Jones Energy, LLC ). (sgon) |
|
3 | 3
order
Joint Administration
Mon 04/15 10:19 AM
Order for Joint Administration Signed on 4/15/2019 (aaloadi) |
|
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Mon 04/15 6:00 AM
|
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 04/15 9:09 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran Jr (Duran, Hector) |
||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Mon 04/15 10:20 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 19-32112 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) |
||
crditcrd
none
Mon 04/15 11:20 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-32111 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21048578. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, April 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Sun 04/14 6:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Jones Energy, LLC. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |