Hatten v. Taronis Technologies Inc et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00889 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 5:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Robert L Dingess
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Mahoney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Pollack
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ermanno P Santilli
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William W Staunton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Taronis Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Armando Martin Campos
4700 Sheridan St. Suite J
Hollywood, FL 33021 |
Represented By
|
Movant
Vardan Petrosyan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Hatten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kui Zhu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Notice of withdrawal of motion
Wed 06/26 10:51 AM
NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Vardan Petrosyan re17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Vardan Petrosyan (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
utility
Acknowledgment - Transferred Case Opened
Mon 06/24 11:51 AM
Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:19-cv-04529, filed 06/21/2019. (JNB) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
transfer
District transfer out
Fri 06/21 3:34 PM
TRANSFER to the District of of Arizona, Phoenix Division. (KE) |
|
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on motion to transfer case
Fri 06/21 11:21 AM
ORDER: 1. The Joint Motion for Transfer of Case to the District of Arizona and Extension of Pending Deadlines 19 is GRANTED. 2. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Phoenix Division of the District of Arizona for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to immediately transfer this case to the Phoenix Division of the District of Arizona. 3. All deadlines in this case are stayed. Defendants are not required to respond to the Complaint. 4. Responses to the Lead Plaintiff motions, to the extent not already filed, shall be filed in the District of Arizona by June 28, 2019, or within five (5) business days after the case is opened in the District of Arizona, whichever is later. 5. Within five (5) business days after Lead Plaintiff is appointed by the presiding court in the District of Arizona, the appointed Lead Plaintiff and Defendants shall submit a schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and a briefing schedule on Defendants' response to that complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/21/2019. (BGS) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Notice of withdrawal of motion
Fri 06/21 9:08 AM
NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Armando Martin Campos re16 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Selection filed by Armando Martin Campos (Komlossy, Emily) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Transfer case
Thu 06/20 3:26 PM
Joint MOTION to transfer case and extension of pending deadlines by All Defendants.(Bugni, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 06/20 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Bugni on behalf of Robert L Dingess, Scott Mahoney, Kevin Pollack, Ermanno P Santilli, William W Staunton, Taronis Technologies Inc (Bugni, Lisa) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 06/14 10:08 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Vardan Petrosyan.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/14 9:29 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Selection by Armando Martin Campos.(Komlossy, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/14 4:19 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Kui Zhu.(Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Loss Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit WH Resume, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Prop Order | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Related case order and track 3 notice
Thu 04/25 9:17 AM
AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3 Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Wed 04/24 1:33 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kevin G. Cooper, appearing on behalf of Chad Hatten (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056306.) Related document:5 MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Wed 04/24 1:34 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew M. Guiney, appearing on behalf of Chad Hatten (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056306.) Related document:5 MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:16 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Taronis Technologies Inc. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:15 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Robert L Dingess. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:14 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Scott Mahoney. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:14 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Ermanno P Santilli. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:13 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to Kevin Pollack. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/23 4:11 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/23/19 by Chad Hatten as to William W Staunton. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 3:13 PM
NOTICE by Chad Hatten of Publication of Notice of Pendency of Action(Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/22 6:10 PM
ORDER granting 5 plaintiff's motion for Matthew M. Guiney and Kevin Cooper to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/18/2019. (DMS) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 04/17 3:57 PM
MOTION for Matthew M. Guiney, Kevin G. Cooper to appear pro hac vice by Chad Hatten. (Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested persons order
Mon 04/15 4:29 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2019. (BGS) |
|
3 | 3
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 04/15 4:29 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2019. (BGS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 1:48 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-889-T-36TGW. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15354354) filed by Chad Hatten.(Tomchin, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit |