Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45240
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2019
Case in other court:Texas Southern, 4:18-cv-04709
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:29 PM EST
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Holland & Knight - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Christina Marie Vitale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Christina Marie Vitale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Christina Marie Vitale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Noelle M. Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom - Houston
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Noelle M. Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom - Houston
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By
Noelle M. Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom - Houston
contact info
Defendant
Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
John William Ellis
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Asher Benjamin Griffin
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Robert Philip Scott, Jr.
Blaszak, Coey, Bennett & Carlson
contact info
Marquel Sautural Jordan
Blank Rome
contact info
Emery Gullickson Richards
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Represented By
John Laurens Wilkes
Jones Day - Houston
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
John William Ellis
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Asher Benjamin Griffin
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
John William Ellis
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Asher Benjamin Griffin
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By
John William Ellis
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Asher Benjamin Griffin
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico
contact info
Defendant
Insys Manufacturing LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Holland & Knight - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Mengis
Baker & Hostetler - Houston
contact info
Matthew Ryan Raley
Baker & Hostetler - Houston
contact info
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Michael Halley Bernick
Reed Smith
contact info
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By
Michael Halley Bernick
Reed Smith
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Represented By
Wesley Hill
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By
Jack Wesley Hill
Ward & Smith
contact info
Wesley Hill
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Christina Marie Vitale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Christina Marie Vitale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Abbot Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Alper T. Ertas
Venable - San Francisco
contact info
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
Represented By
John Laurens Wilkes
Jones Day - Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
County of Leon
Represented By
Mikal C. Watts
Watts Guerra - San Antonio
contact info
Shelly A. Sanford
Watts Guerra - Austin
contact info
Kenneth T. Fibich
Invalid Address - Fibich Hampton Leebron & Garth
contact info
James Caleb Henson
contact info
Alicia Danielle O'Neill
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:47 PM EDT
Thursday, December 13, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-87391 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21468328) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, December 14, 2018
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. identifying Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
3 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
4 4 MOTION to Remand by County of Leon, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019.(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Proposed Order
5 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 20, 2018
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of deadline to respond to complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelly A Sanford on behalf of County of Leon, filed. (Sanford, Shelly) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
8 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 31, 2018
10 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
11 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance, LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allergan Finance, LLC identifying Allergan plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Hill on behalf of Allergan Finance, LLC, filed. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
15 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Ellis, John) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
16 16 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
17 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 of Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 of Decl.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 of Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 of Decl.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 Exhibit 5,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7
Thursday, February 14, 2019
18 18 NOTICE of Decision by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
19 19 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
20 20 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 18, 2019
21 21 ORDER granting20 Motion for Continuance. The deadlines in the Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties are continued until the JPML rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the Conditional Transfer Order or this Court has ruled on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, whichever is later..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
22 22 NOTICE of Decision by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Related [+] [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-] ed, Noelle
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
23 23 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
24 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-04709. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
25 25 Notice of Incomplete Diversity filed by County of Leon.(Sanford, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit