City of Alexandria v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45246 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 1:18-cv-01536 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:29 PM EST |
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Henry Schein, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen%20Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 - 100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
City Of Alexandria
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:54 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
Notice of Correction re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Per CMH chambers) (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 01, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
Set Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
32 | 32
![]() |
|
33 | 33
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (per CMH Chambers) (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
34 | 34
![]() |
|
35 | 35
![]() |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
![]() |
|
37 | 37
![]() |
|
38 | 38
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
39 | 39
![]() |
|
40 | 40
![]() |
|
41 | 41
![]() |
|
42 | 42
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed ,6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
43 | 43
![]() |
|
44 | 44
![]() |
|
45 | 45
![]() |
|
46 | 46
![]() |
|
47 | 47
![]() |
|
48 | 48
![]() |
|
49 | 49
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
50 | 50
![]() |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
51 | 51
![]() |
|
52 | 52
![]() |
|
53 | 53
![]() |
|
54 | 54
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
![]() |
|
56 | 56
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
58 | 58
![]() |
|
59 | 59
![]() |
|
60 | 60
![]() |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
57 | 57
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
61 | 61
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
63 | 63
![]() |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
64 | 64
![]() |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (rban, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
65 | 65
![]() |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
66 | 66
![]() |