Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-31432

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:19-ap-03063
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2019
Terminated:Oct 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Google LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Litigation Trustee of the Adeptus Litigation Trust
Represented By
David W. Elmquist
Reed & Elmquist, P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Kara E. Casteel
Ask, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
court Close adversary case Tue 10/22 2:25 PM
Adversary case 3:19-ap-3063 closed (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 10/21 12:10 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
8 8 order Amend scheduling order Wed 07/17 9:27 AM
Order granting motion to amend agreed scheduling order Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 7/17/2019. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
7 7 motion Amend scheduling order Tue 07/09 7:57 AM
Agreed Motion to amend scheduling order. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2019
6 6 notice Notice (generic) Mon 07/01 1:39 PM
Notice of Service filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
5 5 notice Notice (generic) Mon 06/24 4:08 PM
Notice of Service filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Fri 04/19 1:54 PM
Summons service executed on Google LLC 4/19/2019 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Tue 04/16 4:58 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 4/16/2019 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC
2 2 court Summons issued Tue 04/16 4:56 PM
Summons issued on Google LLC Answer Due 5/16/2019 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 12:30 PM
Adversary case 19-03063 Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC against Google LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. 14. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A
crditcrd none Tue 04/16 3:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-03063 sgj) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26414682, amount $ 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1