Drivetrain, LLC v. Medical White Rock Capital, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-31432
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-31432
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stacey G Jernigan |
Case #: | 3:19-ap-03070 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Medical White Rock Capital, LLC
6338 Cash Oaks Drive
Spring, TX 77379 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Litigation Trustee of the Adeptus Litigation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Tue 09/03 12:04 PM
Adversary case 3:19-ap-3070 closed (Banks, Courtney) |
||
Sunday, August 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order granting motion for default judgment Entered on 8/16/2019. (Rielly, Bill) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing held
Thu 08/15 4:06 PM
Hearing held on 8/12/2019. (Appearances: D. Elmquist and K. Casteel (telephonically) for Plan Trustee. Evidentiary hearing. Motion granted. Counsel to upload judgment.)(Edmond, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of hearing filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC . Hearing to be held on 8/12/2019 at 02:30 PM Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm for9 , (Casteel, Kara) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Clerk's entry of default as to Defendant Medical White Rock Capital, LLC., d/b/a Texas Emergency Training |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion for clerk's entry of default against Medical White Rock Capital, LLC dba Texas Emergency Training filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Service filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Service filed by Plaintiff Drivetrain, LLC. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons service executed on Medical White Rock Capital, LLC 4/19/2019 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 4/17/2019 (Edmond, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons issued on Medical White Rock Capital, LLC Answer Due 5/17/2019 (Edmond, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-03070 Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC against Medical White Rock Capital, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . 13. 14. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/16 3:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-03070 sgj) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26414682, amount $ 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |