Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45254
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2019
Case in other court:Virginia Western, 1:18-cv-00046
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:30 PM EST
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By
Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca C. Mandel
Hogan Lovells Us - Washington
contact info
Jon Myer Talotta
Hogan Lovells
contact info
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Represented By
William H. Jordan
Alston & Bird
contact info
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Brian D. Boone
Alston & Bird
contact info
Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Alston & Bird - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By
William H. Jordan
Alston & Bird
contact info
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Brian D. Boone
Alston & Bird
contact info
Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Alston & Bird - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By
William H. Jordan
Alston & Bird
contact info
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Brian D. Boone
Alston & Bird
contact info
Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Alston & Bird - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
Defendant
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Does 1-100
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Jake Redon Miller
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Jake Redon Miller
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By
Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Hirschler Law
contact info
Julian W. Park
Kobre & Kim - San Francisco
contact info
Steven G. Kobre
Kobre & Kim - New York
contact info
Matthew I. Menchel
Kobre & Kim
contact info
Adriana Riviere-Badell
Kobre & Kim - Miami
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By
Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Hirschler Law
contact info
Julian W. Park
Kobre & Kim - San Francisco
contact info
Steven G. Kobre
Kobre & Kim - New York
contact info
Matthew I. Menchel
Kobre & Kim
contact info
Adriana Riviere-Badell
Kobre & Kim - Miami
contact info
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
Plaintiff
Washington County, Virginia
Represented By
William Edgar Spivey
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Lauren Tallent Rogers
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Grant Edward Morris
Sanford Heisler
contact info
Kevin H. Sharp
Sanford Heisler Sharp
contact info
Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:58 PM EDT
Thursday, December 13, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number CL18-1769. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3033377), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company.(ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 137 pgs Exhibit 1 - State Court Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Original Complaint and Motion for Leave,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/13/2018. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
6 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Washington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
8 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
11 11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Washington County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) Modified on 1/8/2019 - referral text removed (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
12 12 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/20/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2019 02:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand.(ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Notice of Tag-Along,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- JPML Rules
15 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
16 16 Brief / Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 State Court Records received from Washington County Circuit Court, CL18-1769(lml) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Record - Part 2
Friday, December 21, 2018
18 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, N.V., Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
20 20 RESPONSE in Support re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Amending Briefing Order. The previously scheduled hearing in Roanoke at 2:00 p.m. on January 2, 2019, is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/21/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Notice of Cancellation of 1/2/2019 Motion Hearing (Cancel Court Reporter) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 31, 2018
23 23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, In(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/2/2019 to remove referral at direction of chambers (ck). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
24 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Original Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Lac Courtes Oreilles Opinion,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Rancheria Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Kentucky Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- City of Portland Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- San Mateo Order,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8- Combined Orders Granting Stays,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9- Noble County Order,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10- Jefferson County Order
Tuesday, January 01, 2019
25 25 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Washington County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Thursday, January 03, 2019
26 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed ,11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This hearing has been set for two hours. If you think the hearing will take longer than two hours, please contact the Courtroom Deputy as soon as possible. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
27 27 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3043935. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3043936. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 07, 2019
29 29 ORAL ORDER granting27 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julian W. Park for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/7/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORAL ORDER granting28 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/7/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
31 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
32 32 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re20 Response in Support of Motion,6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Statement of Interest
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
33 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
34 34 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
36 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
37 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
38 38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3046875. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
39 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Washington County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
40 40 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047367. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
41 41 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047369. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
42 42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047369 by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/10/2019 to reflect Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice instead of Motion to Amend (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
43 43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047793. by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 11, 2019
44 44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3048377. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
45 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
46 46 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal Filed By Endo Defendants and in Support of Motion to Remand . filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
47 47 ORAL ORDER granting38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
48 48 ORAL ORDER granting40 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven G. Kobre for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
49 49 ORAL ORDER granting42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew I. Menchel for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
50 50 ORAL ORDER granting43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jake R. Miller for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
51 51 ORAL ORDER granting44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
52 52 ORAL ORDER granting45 Motion for Leave to File. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand at45 Exhibit A is deemed filed. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
53 53 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3049301. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
54 54 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
55 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
56 56 Response re35 Notice (Other) . filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
57 57 ORAL ORDER granting53 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
58 58 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re56 (NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.S RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
59 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2019 re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Washington County, Virginia,23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.,11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Court Reporter: M. Butenschoen) (bwd) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
60 60 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re6 ,23 of Supplemental Authorities(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
61 61 NOTICE by Washington County, Virginia re6 (Additional Authority)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
62 62 NOTICE by Washington County, Virginia re6 (EDVA Decision)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
63 63 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re6 ,23 of Supplemental Authority(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 11, 2019
64 64 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re6 ,23 of Supplemental Authorities(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, February 14, 2019
65 65 12 pgs Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part11 Motion to Expedite and granting23 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
66 66 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
67 67 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 1:18-cv-00046. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]