wlv sunset plaza, LLC v. Gusinow et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:19-bk-10270
Lead BK case is: 9:19-bk-10270
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Deborah J Saltzman |
Case #: | 9:19-ap-01020 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kevin Gusinow
27001 Agoura Road, #350
Calabasas, CA 91301 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Best Alliance Foreclosure & Lien Services
16133 Ventura Boulevard Suite 700
Encino, CA 91436 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
wlv sunset plaza, LLC
1014 S. Westlake Boulevard Suite 14 #261
Westlake Village, CA 91361 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 07/03 3:05 PM
Hearing / Status Conference Hearing Vacated: Order dismissing complaint was entered on 5/29/19. (Rust, Kam) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/25 9:58 AM
Adversary Case 9:19-ap-1020 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice
Tue 06/18 2:07 PM
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Vacating Previously Recorded Lis Pendens (L.A. County Recording Document No. 20190376870, Recorded on April 26, 2019); with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff wlv sunset plaza, LLC . (Steinberg, Peter) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 05/31 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wed 05/29 4:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/29/2019. (Rust, Kam) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Wed 05/29 8:42 AM
Notice of lodgment with proof of service Filed by Defendant Kevin Gusinow . (Beall, William) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Tue 05/28 4:27 PM
Hearing Held (Rust, Kam) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Reply
Tue 05/21 11:33 AM
Reply to Joinder to Kevin Gusinow's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Best Alliance Foreclosure & Lien Services (Kirby, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Reply
Mon 05/20 11:57 AM
Reply to with proof of service Filed by Defendant Kevin Gusinow (Beall, William) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Opposition
Mon 05/13 2:21 PM
Opposition to Opposition of Plaintiff wlv sunset plaza, LLC to Defendant Gusinow's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Points and Authorities in Support; with Exhibits A and B; and Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff wlv sunset plaza, LLC (Steinberg, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 05/08 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/08/2019. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Wed 05/08 12:59 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 5/28/2019 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Tue 05/07 4:09 PM
Notice of Joinder to Kevin Gusinow's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Best Alliance Foreclosure & Lien Services . (Kirby, Dean) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 05/07 3:54 PM
Notice of Hearing with proof of service Filed by Defendant Kevin Gusinow . (Beall, William) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion)
Tue 05/07 3:52 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with proof of service Filed by Defendant Kevin Gusinow (Beall, William) |
|
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Tue 05/07 9:08 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 07/03/2019 at 01:00 PM 1415 State Street Courtroom 201 Santa Barbara, CA 93101 for1 , (Bertelsen, Susan) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/06 12:59 PM
Certificate of Service RE: Notice of Rescheduled Status Hearing . (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
5 | 5
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Mon 05/06 12:40 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Status Hearing. Hearing to be held on 7/3/2019 at 1:00 PM, 1415 State Street, Courtroom 201, Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/6/2019 . (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Mon 04/29 2:38 PM
Notice of Filing In Adversary Action A True and Correct Copy of Notice of Pending Action (Lis Pendens); with Exhibit A and Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff wlv sunset plaza, LLC . (Steinberg, Peter) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Thu 04/25 3:47 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case information was entered at the time of filing RE: Demand Amount. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 3:41 PM
Summons Issued on Plaintiff, Service to be Made Upon Defendant Kevin Gusinow Date Issued 4/25/2019, Answer Due 5/28/2019 Status hearing to be held on 7/3/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (Bertelsen, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 12:44 PM
Adversary case 9:19-ap-01020. Complaint by wlv sunset plaza, LLC against Kevin Gusinow, Best Alliance Foreclosure & Lien Services. (Charge To Estate). with Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Steinberg, Peter) |