Barbieri v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01201 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:19-cv-01499 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2019 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ANSUL COMPANY One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Plaintiff
Hannelore T Barbieri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 06/07 1:47 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos.: granting 5058 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Motion to Withdraw Stephen M Cox as Attorney for The Chemours Company and The Chemours Company FC LLC (collectively, "The Chemours Company")(in case 2:18-cv-03359-RMG;in case 2:18-cv-03432-RMG;in case 2:18-cv-03438-RMG;in case 2:18-cv-03488-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-01201-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-01806-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-01850-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-02192-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-02196-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-02281-RMG;in case 2:19-cv-02285-RMG). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/7/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
62 | 62
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 06/04 12:26 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cox, Stephen) |