California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:19-cv-02410
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:May 02, 2019
Terminated:Dec 02, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2019 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Nancy Albarran
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Jeeysi Arango
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
J. Dominic Bejarano
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Loretta Gustafson
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Yvonne King
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Jodi Lax
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Mary Anne Pereira
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Seth Reddy
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
San Jose Unified School District
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Defendant
Penny Walman
Represented By
Jacquelyn Kimmet Wilson
Samuelson, Wilson & Roe
contact info
Plaintiff
D C
Represented By
Amanda Katherine O'Neal
Tollner Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector Castillo
Represented By
Amanda Katherine O'Neal
Tollner Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Castillo
Represented By
Amanda Katherine O'Neal
Tollner Law Offices
contact info

GPO Jun 25 2019
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Plaintiffs to show cause why Rule 17(c) does not apply or, in the alternative, to apply ex parte for an order appointing Hector and Margaret Castillo as guardians ad litem for D.C. by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
GPO Dec 02 2020
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Re: Dkt. No. 43. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/2/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
44 44 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/02 7:03 PM
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Re: Dkt. No. 43 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/2/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
43 43 4 pgs order Order Wed 12/02 7:01 PM
ORDER APPROVING 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Settlement of Minor's Claims. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/2/2020.(lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/01 3:35 PM
NOTICE by Margaret Castillo Request for Compromise of Minor's Claims(Tollner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Minor's Compromise,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Settlement,
Att: 3 Exhibit A for Petition and Order,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, September 11, 2020
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Sat 09/12 1:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2020 is continued to 12/9/2020, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Continue Fri 09/11 5:12 PM
Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by D C. (Tollner, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
39 39 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 06/30 6:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2020 to 9/30/2020, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Updated Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2020. Current deadlines remain in place. Court to discuss ADR at next CMC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 06/30 5:42 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Margaret Castillo. (Tollner, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/18 4:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part 36 Stipulation to Continue Case Deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM; Parties may appear telephonically. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2021 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (sp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/18 2:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo.(O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance
Friday, January 03, 2020
35 35 order Protective Order Fri 01/03 4:09 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/3/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 01/03 2:02 PM
STIPULATION Re Protective Order filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo. (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Errata Fri 01/03 11:28 AM
ERRATA re13 Waiver of Service Executed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo. (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
32 32 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 12/04 1:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court VACATES the Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2019. Deadline to amend pleadings and add parties is 1/3/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2020 10:00 AM. Joint case management statement due by 4/1/2020. All non-expert discovery must be completed by 9/14/2020. Discovery from expert witnesses must be completed by 11/30/2020. Dispositive motions must be set for hearing no later than 1/11/2021 at 01:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/4/2019. (lmhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
31 31 misc Case Management Statement Tue 12/03 4:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo. (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
30 30 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 12/03 4:40 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
29 29 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:05 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Penny Waldman (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:04 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Seth Reddy (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
27 27 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:03 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Mary Anne Pereira (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:02 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Jody Lax (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
25 25 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:01 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Yvonne King (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
24 24 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 11:00 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Loretta Gustafson (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 10:59 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Dominic Bejarano (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
22 22 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 10:58 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Jeeysi Arango (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 10:58 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Nancy Albarran (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/26 10:56 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Of San Jose Unified School District (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/18 5:27 PM
MODIFIED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 18 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/17 4:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Continuance filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo.(O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT, INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
17 17 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/11 12:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Albarran, Jeeysi Arango, J. Dominic Bejarano, Loretta Gustafson, Yvonne King, Jodi Lax, Mary Anne Pereira, Seth Reddy, San Jose Unified School District, Penny Walman.. (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 08/28 10:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 1:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byNancy Albarran, Jeeysi Arango, J. Dominic Bejarano. (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 1:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLoretta Gustafson, Yvonne King, Jodi Lax, Mary Anne Pereira, Seth Reddy, San Jose Unified School District, Penny Walman. (Wilson, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/25 4:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Margaret Castillo, Hector Castillo, D C. Service waived by All Defendants. (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Mon 07/08 11:32 AM
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo 9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/05 4:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 10 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Counsel may participate by telephone. Case Management Statement due 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 07/05 12:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT, INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo.(O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
9 9 motion Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Wed 06/26 5:54 PM
Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem filed by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo.(O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent of Nominee,
Att: 2 Declaration of Proposed GAL,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Petition for Appointment of GAL
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/25 10:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Plaintiffs to show cause why Rule 17(c) does not apply or, in the alternative, to apply ex parte for an order appointing Hector and Margaret Castillo as guardians ad litem for D.C. by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 06/25 4:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 to 8/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2019. Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/9/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 1:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo.. (O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/08 3:45 PM
Amended Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/08 3:11 PM
AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by D C, Hector Castillo, Margaret Castillo (O'Neal, Amanda) Modified on 5/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Fri 05/03 2:51 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/03 10:55 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2019. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13313668.). Filed byMargaret Castillo, Hector Castillo, D C.(O'Neal, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet