Subscriber Holdings, LLC v. Brightstar Corp. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01991 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jan 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2019 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Brightstar Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar Device Protection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar Re Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mobile Leasing Solutions, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Assurance Corp.
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Global Group Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Investment Corp.
|
|
Interested Party
Sean Woodward
|
|
Plaintiff
Subscriber Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Brightstar Logistics Pty Limited
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
Brightstar Telecommunications India Ltd.
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
SoftBank Group Corp.
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
Sprint Corporation
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
226 | 226
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE by Subscriber Holdings, LLC of Counsel Change of Firm and Contact Information (Nixon, Coby) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
225 | 225
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/26 3:24 PM
ORDER granting224 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Plaintiff shall be permitted to depose Mr. Bodnarek a second time on a date to be agreed by counsel and the witness, provided the deposition conclude within one hour of being opened and the questioning be limited to solicit testimony relevant to documents that have been produced in discovery since Mr. Bodnarek's first deposition in 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/26/2024. (bmr) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
224 | 224
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/22 6:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION For Leave To Take the Videotaped Deposition of Clay Bodnarek by Subscriber Holdings, LLC.(Nixon, Coby) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |