Subscriber Holdings, LLC v. Brightstar Corp. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01991 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jan 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2019 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Brightstar Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar Device Protection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar Re Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brightstar US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mobile Leasing Solutions, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Assurance Corp.
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Global Group Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Brightstar Investment Corp.
|
|
Interested Party
Sean Woodward
|
|
Plaintiff
Subscriber Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Brightstar Logistics Pty Limited
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
Brightstar Telecommunications India Ltd.
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
SoftBank Group Corp.
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|
|
Defendant
Sprint Corporation
Terminated: 07/29/2019
|