California Southern District Court
Judge:Larry Alan Burns
Referred: Andrew G Schopler
Case #: 3:19-cv-00837
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332dtp Diversity - Deceptive Trade Practices
Case Filed:May 03, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 30, 2019 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Airgas USA, LLC
Represented By
Kanika D Corley
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc.
Represented By
John Kenneth Landay
Landay Roberts LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 08 2019
ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 4). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/8/2019. (jdt)
GPO Nov 21 2019
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16). If Lit'l Pepper elects to amend, it must do so no later than 1/13/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/21/2019. (jdt)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 20, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/20 7:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/20 10:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc.. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
21 21 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/21 4:45 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.16 ). If Lit'l Pepper elects to amend, it must do so no later than 1/13/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/21/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
20 20 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Tue 09/10 12:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 9/23/2019 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.16 ). The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on Monday, 9/23/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/10/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/14 2:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Airgas USA, LLC. (Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/07 6:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc.. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Thu 07/18 11:29 AM
ORDER Resetting Briefing Schedule re16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Responses due by 8/7/2019. Replies due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/17/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
16 16 motion Dismiss Tue 07/16 5:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Airgas USA, LLC.(Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Monday, July 08, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 07/08 4:12 PM
ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.4 ). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/8/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/02 4:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Airgas USA, LLC, filed by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc.. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
13 13 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Wed 06/19 11:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Tuesday, 6/25/2019 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.4 ). The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on Tuesday, 6/25/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/19/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 06/19 9:24 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Lawrence D. Silverman Related [+]. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns.(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
11 11 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 06/19 9:22 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra M. Mora Related [+]. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns.(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 06/18 4:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Airgas USA, LLC. (Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 1:22 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12615254.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Silverman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 12:49 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12615067.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mora, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 06/11 7:22 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/11 7:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lit'l Pepper Gourmet, Inc.. (Landay, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/20 12:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 6/24/2019 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No.4 ). Due to scheduling conflicts, that hearing is rescheduled for Tuesday, 6/25/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Plaintiff's opposition is due 6/11/2019 and Defendant's reply, if any, is due 6/18/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/20/2019. (jdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 05/10 4:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Airgas USA, LLC.(Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 05/07 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Airgas USA, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc., Corporate Parent L'Air Liquide S.A. for Airgas USA, LLC. (Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/07 11:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airgas USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent L'Air Liquide S.A. for Airgas USA, LLC.. (Corley, Kanika)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/06 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California County of San Diego, case number 37201900016827-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12476196.), filed by Airgas USA, LLC. The new case number is 3:19-cv-00837-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(als) (jao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Declaration of Shawn Cruikshank,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Declaration of Alexandra Mora,
Att: 6 Proof of Service