County of Blanco v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45237 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:18-cv-04705 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:35 PM EST |
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2019 3:21 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.] | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |