City of Saco v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45310 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maine, 2:19-cv-00143 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:35 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas J. Jorgensen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark E. Cieniawski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael B. Bruehl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Saco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/10/2019 1:26 PM EST |
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 4/15/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due by 4/15/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw)[Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2003276.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7 ORDER granting6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
36 | 36
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Att: 34
![]() |
||
Att: 35
![]() |
||
Att: 36
![]() |
||
Att: 37
![]() |
||
Att: 38
![]() |
||
Att: 39
![]() |
||
Att: 40
![]() |
||
Att: 41
![]() |
||
Att: 42
![]() |
||
Att: 43
![]() |
||
Att: 44
![]() |
||
Att: 45
![]() |
||
Att: 46
![]() |
||
Att: 47
![]() |
||
Att: 48
![]() |
||
Att: 49
![]() |
||
Att: 50
![]() |
||
Att: 51
![]() |
||
Att: 52
![]() |
||
Att: 53
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 4/26/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from CHARLES C. LIFLAND & DONNA WELCH by 4/26/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
27 | 27
![]() |
|
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
32 | 32
![]() |
|
33 | 33
![]() |
|
34 | 34
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 5/8/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 5/13/2019.] | ||
35 | 35
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
![]() |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
![]() |