Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45327
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Case in other court:South Carolina, 3:19-cv-01207
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:35 PM EST
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Plaintiff
Richland County South Carolina
Represented By
James Todd Rutherford
Rutherford Law Firm
contact info
Douglas D. Treasurer
contact info
Clarence Davis
Griffin Davis
contact info
William Paul Walker, Jr.
Walker Morgan & Kinard
contact info
Luther James Battiste, III
Johnson Toal & Battiste
contact info
Peter T. Phillips
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:54 PM EDT
Thursday, April 25, 2019
1 1 272 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8408737.), filed by Richland County South Carolina. Service due by 7/24/2019(alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richland County South Carolina.(alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
6 6 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, INSYS Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Walmart Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc.(alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of Defendants
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
7 7 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 91. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 3:19-cv-01207. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]