City of Fairbanks, Alaska v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01414 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Alaska, 4:19-cv-00013 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2019 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
successor-in-interest to Ansul Co. One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Fairbanks, Alaska
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 06/07 2:58 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos.: granting 5050 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Motion to Withdraw Ashley B Campbell as Attorney for 63 plaintiffs. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/7/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/31 4:02 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by City of Riverside, Barnstable County, Town of Canton, Massachusetts, South Montebello Irrigation District, State of North Carolina, ex rel., Joshua H Stein, Village of Rockdale Illinois, Town of Mansfield, Massachusetts, Milwaukee County Wisconsin, Sudbury Water District, City of Camden, New Jersey, Meadows At Cross River Water-Works Corporation, City of East Peoria Illinois, Orchard Dale Water District, Rock Island, Illinois, City of, Town of Lewisboro, New York, The, City of Collinsville Illinois, City of Fairbanks, Alaska, Jurupa Community Services District, Verona, New Jersey, The Township of, City of Moline, Illinois, Town of Hudson Massachusetts, City of North Chicago, Illinois, City of Crest Hill Illinois, City of Tallahassee, Florida, City of Sacramento, Hopedale, Massachusetts, Town of, Chino Basin Desalter Authority, Camrosa Water District, City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District, New Hampshire, State of, Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District, Miami-Dade County Florida, North Park Public Water District, Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority, The, La Habra Heights County Water District, Cary, Illinois, Village of, Pleasant Valley Public Water District Illinois, Golden State Water Company, Village of South Elgin, Illinois, The, California Domestic Water Company, Town of Burlington Massachusetts, City of Elgin, Illinois, Sammamish Plateau Water and Sewer District, Water Replenishment District of Southern California, Bellflower-Somerset Mutual Water Company, Town of Poughkeepsie, New York, Suburban Water Systems, Montebello Land and Water Company, Borough of Rocky Hill New Jersey, The, City of Monterey Park, Village of Channahon Illinois, Kennebunk Kennebunkport and Wells Water District, Santa Margarita Water District, Centerville Osterville Marstons Mills Fire District-Water Department, East Moline, Illinois, City of, Rubidoux Community Services District, City of Pensacola, Garfield, New Jersey, City of, Pico Water District, City of Westfield, Massachusetts, Borough of Point Pleasant New Jersey, Lake In The Hills, Illinois, Village of, Illinois Municipal Corporation East Alton, The. Response to Motion due by 6/14/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Campbell, Ashley) |