New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Carol Bagley Amon
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:19-cv-02987
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:May 20, 2019
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2019 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
Law Office of Yuriy Prakhin, P.C.
Represented By
Edgar Mikel Rivera
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yuriy Prakhin
Represented By
Edgar Mikel Rivera
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yelena Ruderman
Represented By
Patrick Joseph Collopy
Faruqi & Faruqi LLP
contact info
Alex J. Hartzband
Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP
contact info
Innessa Melamed Huot
Faruqi & Faruqi LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 22 2021
Minute Entry and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/22/2021. Defendants' 45 motion to compel and plaintiff's 47 motion to compel are granted in limited part, as described in the attached minute entry. See attached for deadlines. (Proujansky, Josh)
GPO Mar 22 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 47 Letter MOTION to Compel filed by Yelena Ruderman. For the reasons discussed, plaintiff's motion to compel is denied. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/22/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
308 308 appeal USCA Order Tue 12/17 11:55 AM
ORDER of USCA as to285 Notice of Appeal, filed by Law Office of Yuriy Prakhin, P.C., Yuriy Prakhin. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Certified copy issued: 12/17/2024. USCA# - 24-1186 (AMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
307 307 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/11 5:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Yelena Ruderman (Huot, Innessa)
Related: [-]