Lowry v. Purdue Pharma, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45348 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-01223 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:38 PM EST |
Defendant
Advanced Pain Specialists, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Comprehensive Pain Specialists, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Creighton, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janna Lowry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 5:00 PM EDT |
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 5/30/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation to Extend Manufacturer Defendants' Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 14), which the Court construes as a Motion for Extension of Time, is GRANTED. The moving defendants shall have through and including sixty (60) days of the later of (a) the Court's ruling on the motion to remand filed by Plaintiff or (b) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ruling on a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order as to this case (assuming one is filed by Plaintiff), to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/17/19. (THL) [Transferred from moed on 5/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 5/30/2019.] | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |