California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:19-cv-04841
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2019
Terminated:Mar 03, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2019 1:45 AM PST
Defendant
Francesca Cavallo
Represented By
Katherine Kleindienst
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info
David W Swift
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Timbuktu Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Amanda L Goodman
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Mandana Massoumi
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Emil Petrossian
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
26 26 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Wed 03/04 9:43 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
25 25 order Dismissing Case Wed 03/04 9:03 AM
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case24 . Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Mon 03/02 4:48 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc..(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
23 23 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 01/22 12:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND FURTHER AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT FRANCESCA CAVALLO'SPENDING ANTI-SLAPP MOTION22 by Judge George H. Wu. The Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs deadline for opposing Defendant's anti-SLAPP motion (Docket No. 16)shall be Monday, March 2, 2020. Defendant's deadline for filing a reply brief in support of her anti-SLAPP motion shall be Monday, March 16, 2020. The hearing on Defendant's anti-SLAPP motion shall occur on Monday, March 30, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
22 22 stip Continue Fri 01/17 5:12 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Amended Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant Francesca Cavallo's Pending Anti-SLAPP Motion from February 24, 2020 to March 30, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to California's Anti-SLAPP Statute Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 16 filed by plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc..(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 11/21 2:55 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT FRANCESCA CAVALLOS PENDING ANTI-SLAPP MOTION by Judge George H. Wu19 . NOW THEREFORE, for good cause shown, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs deadline for opposing Defendants anti-SLAPP motion (Docket No. 16) shall be Monday, January 27, 2020. Defendant's deadline for filing a reply brief in support of her anti-SLAPP motion shall be Monday, February 10, 2020. The hearing on Defendant's anti-SLAPP motion shall occur on Monday, February 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/18 2:24 PM
NOTICE Notice of Errata Attaching Stipulation Regarding Continuance of Hearing Date and Amended Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant Francesca Cavallo's Pending Anti-SLAPP Motion filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc.. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
19 19 stip Continue Mon 11/18 2:04 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Amended Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant Francesca Cavallo's Pending Anti-SLAPP Motion from December 19, 2019 to February 24, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to California's Anti-SLAPP Statute Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 16 filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc..(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/04 3:13 PM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Francesca Cavallo's Pending Anti Slapp Motion,17 . The Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs deadline for opposing Defendants anti-SLAPP motion (Docket No. 16) shall be Monday, November 25, 2019. Defendants deadline for filing a reply brief in support of her anti-SLAPP motion shall be Friday, December 6, 2019. The hearing on Defendants anti-SLAPP motion shall occur on Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
17 17 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/30 5:17 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to California's Anti-SLAPP Statute Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 16 filed by plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc..(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule
16 16 motion Strike Fri 08/30 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to California's Anti-SLAPP Statute Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Francesca Cavallo. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Declaration of Francesca Cavallo,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Friday, August 09, 2019
15 15 order Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/12 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re:12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's ex parte application to extend the deadline to respond to the Complaint from August 12, 2019 to August 30, 2019 is GRANTED and Defendant's response is hereby due on or before August 30, 2019. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
14 14 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 08/08 11:11 AM
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/30/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 12 filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc.. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
13 13 respm Amendment (Motion related) Wed 08/07 3:35 PM
Amendment to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/30/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 12 filed by Defendant Francesca Cavallo. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extend Time to File Answer Wed 08/07 12:09 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/30/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Francesca Cavallo. (Attorney David W Swift added to party Francesca Cavallo(pty:dft)) (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 07/17 10:15 AM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Francesca Cavallo answer now due 8/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc..(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/17 10:12 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc., upon Defendant Francesca Cavallo served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Francesca Cavallo in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Service of the Summons and Complaint were made upon Defendant Francesca Cavallo's authorized representative for service of process, Vicki J. Greene, Esq. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
9 9 10 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 11:51 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/05 9:02 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Francesca Cavallo. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 06/04 5:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/04 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 06/03 6:56 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Timbuktu Labs, Inc.. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/03 6:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Timbuktu Labs, Inc. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 06/03 6:53 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc., identifying Francesca Cavallo. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 06/03 6:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc.. (Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/03 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 06/03/2019, receipt number 0973-23852109), filed by Plaintiff Timbuktu Labs, Inc.. (Attorney Emil Petrossian added to party Timbuktu Labs, Inc.(pty:mov))(Petrossian, Emil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet