Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC et al v. City of Plano, Texas
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-00412 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Dec 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 2:50 AM CST |
Defendant
City of Plano, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Constance Swanston
7849 Cassion Drive
Frisco, TX 75034 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
166 | 166
respm
Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/07 9:27 AM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re154 MOTION to Enter Judgment filed by Shannon Jones, Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC . (Hunt, Richard) |