Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45371
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2019
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-00157
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:43 PM EST
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant
Insys Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Missouri CVS LLC
Represented By
Eric R. Delinsky
Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Target Corporation
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
Defendant
United Health Group, Incorporated
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
Defendant
Walgreen Company
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Dannie E. Williams
Represented By
F. Scott Galt
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Fred Jacob Kohut, III
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actiavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By
Gerald P. Greiman
Spencer Fane
contact info
Eric R. Delinsky
Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Caremark LLC
Represented By
Eric R. Delinsky
Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By
Eric R. Delinsky
Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington
contact info
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By
Eric R. Delinsky
Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
Defendant
Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC
Represented By
F. Scott Galt
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Fred Jacob Kohut, III
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Defendant
DepoMed Inc
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff
Dent County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Greene County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Washington County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Independence, Missouri, City of
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Iron County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Butler County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Texas County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasper County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Cape Girardeau County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Taney County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Stone County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Ste Genevieve County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Madison County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Perry County
Perry County Attorney 481 Main Street, Suite 2
Hazard, KY 41701
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Dunklin County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Joplin
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Crawford County
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Franklin County
Terminated: 07/24/2019
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Jefferson County
Terminated: 07/24/2019
Represented By
Sarah Shoemake Doles
Carey & Danis
contact info
Alyson Marie Petrick
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Carey, Danis & Lowe
contact info
Jeffrey J. Lowe
Carey Danis & Lowe
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2019 9:48 AM EDT
Thursday, January 31, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC00203, with receipt number 0865-7012240, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Transfer Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, State Court File,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Attachment A & B to Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. Parent companies: CVS Health Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: CVS Health Corporation,. (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Direct-Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Crawford County, Taney County, Ste Genevieve County, Washington County, Franklin County, Greene County, Iron County, Perry County, Texas County, Butler County, Stone County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Jasper County, City of Joplin, Cape Girardeau County, Dunklin County, Dent County, Christian County, Independence, Missouri, City of.(BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
5 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc Sent To: State Court - Executed (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
6 6 MOTION to Stay [Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.] by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 20 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re6 MOTION to Stay [Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.] filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Conditional Transfer Order dtd 2-6-19,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Transfer Order dtd 2-7-19
8 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Shoemake Doles for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Doles, Sarah) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Alyson Marie Petrick for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Petrick, Alyson) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John Francis Garvey, Jr for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Garvey, John) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER granting6 Motion to Stay: The Moving Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on Plaintiffs' motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. The parties must notify this Court within three days of the JPML's decision on the motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/7/2019. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
12 12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 14 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County.(Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, March 11, 2019
15 15 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose [Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose] filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 18, 2019
16 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose filed by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County.(Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
17 17 STIPULATION re12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
18 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Fred Jacob Kohut, III for Defendants Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, Dannie E. Williams. (Kohut, Fred) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
19 19 ENTRY of Appearance by F. Scott Galt for Defendants Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, Dannie E. Williams. (Galt, F.) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
20 20 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
21 21 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
22 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:19-cv-00157. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]