Anthony v. The Boeing Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | David C Norton |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01656 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2019 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Anthony
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit: Black Boeing worker harassed, found noose at desk (latimes.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/17/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by The Boeing Company. (Floyd, William) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/25 1:12 PM
TEXT ORDER Defendant has filed a motion to stay deadlines and entry of a scheduling order pending resolution of its partial motion to dismiss. However, after the filing of that motion, Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint which dropped two of the three causes of action at issue in the pending partial motion to dismiss. See Rule 15 (A)(1)(B), Fed.R.Civ.P. Therefore, based on the current status of the case, Defendant's partial motion to dismiss, its motion to stay deadlines and entry of a scheduling order, and its motion to extend time to file a Reply are now moot. Further, even if the Defendant files a new partial motion to dismiss (as its responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint) as to the only remaining cause of action that was at issue in its former motion to dismiss, four other causes of action are in the Complaint. Therefore, a scheduling order will be issued after a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint is filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/25/2019.(egra, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Response in Opposition to Motion, by The Boeing Company. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Floyd, William) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Curtis Anthony, filed by Curtis Anthony. Service due by 10/21/2019 (Gist, Donald) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Curtis Anthony.(Gist, Donald) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Curtis Anthony.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Gist, Donald) |
|
9 | 9
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Curtis Anthony, filed by Curtis Anthony. Service due by 10/16/2019 (Gist, Donald) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Entry of Scheduling Order by The Boeing Company. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Floyd, William) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by The Boeing Company.(Floyd, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Boeing Company.(Floyd, William) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Boeing Company. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Floyd, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by The Boeing Company.(hada, ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to The Boeing Company. (hada, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against The Boeing Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8492377.), filed by Chris Anthony. Service due by 9/5/2019. (hada, ) |