Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45331
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2019
Case in other court:Wisconsin Western, 3:19-cv-00340
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:50 PM EST
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo International plc
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
City of Superior
Represented By
Casey Paul Shorts
Previant Law Firm
contact info
Steven G. Kluender
Previant Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:50 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 138 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2455285.), filed by City of Superior, (Shorts, Casey) Modified on 4/30/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Purdue Pharma, L.P.,
Att: 3 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 5 Summons - Insys Therapeutics, Inc.,
Att: 6 Summons - Watson Laboratories, Inc.,
Att: 7 Summons - McKesson Corporation,
Att: 8 Summons - Cardinal Health, Inc.,
Att: 9 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation,
Att: 10 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.,
Att: 11 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. I,
Att: 12 Summons - Cephalon, Inc.,
Att: 13 Summons - Allergan PLC,
Att: 14 Summons - Omnicare Distribution Center LLC,
Att: 15 Summons - Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.,
Att: 16 Summons - Endo International PLC,
Att: 17 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC,
Att: 18 Summons - Actavis LLC,
Att: 19 Summons - Actavis, Inc.,
Att: 20 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC,
Att: 21 Summons - Actavis Pharma
2 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Cephalon, Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd,
Att: 3 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons Endo International. Inc.,
Att: 5 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 6 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 7 Summons Insys Therapeutics, Inc.,
Att: 8 Summons Mallinckrodt PLC,
Att: 9 Summons Mallinckrodt LLC,
Att: 10 Summons Allergan PLC,
Att: 11 Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc.,
Att: 12 Summons Actavis LLC,
Att: 13 Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 14 Summons Amerisourcebergen Corporation,
Att: 15 Summons Cardinal Health, Inc.,
Att: 16 Summons McKesson Corporation,
Att: 17 Summons Omnicare Distribution Center LLC,
Att: 18 Summons Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.,
Att: 19 Summons Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Thursday, May 16, 2019
3 3 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/15/2019. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
4 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00340. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]