Shelby Resources, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:19-bk-51199 |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Shelby Resources, LLC
Frost Brown Todd LLC Lexington Financial Center 250 West Main Street, Suite 2800
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51199 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51199 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51199 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2023. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 05/03 12:31 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 23-5039 . Receipt Number 400005, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Quarterly Post Confirmation Report for Filing Period 12/31/2021, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51199 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51199 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 09/30 9:55 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5021 . Receipt Number 311524, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 09/30 10:30 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5022 . Receipt Number 311525, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Schedule(s) filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC, Statement of Financial Affairs, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules , filed by Shelby Resources, LLC, Disclosure of Fees filed by Patricia K. Burgess Attorney for Debtor. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 07/29 4:38 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5014 . Receipt Number 311315, Fee Amount 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/19/2019. (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Martin B. Tucker Filed by on behalf of Community Trust Bank, Inc.. (Tucker, Martin) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Entry
Tue 06/18 1:32 PM
Entry - An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced by Cambrian Holding Company, Inc., Cambrian Coal LLC, Apex Energy, Inc., C.W. Augering, Inc., Marshall Resources, Inc., PLM Holding Company LLC, Bear Branch Coal LLC, Clintwood Elkhorn Mining LLC, Gatliff Coal LLC, Perry County Coal LLC, Ray Coal LLC, Whitaker Coal LLC, Pike-Letcher Land LLC, Premier Elkhorn Coal LLC, Raven Rock Development LLC, Rich Mountain Coal LLC, S. T. & T. Leasing, Inc. and Shelby Resources, LLC. The docket in Case No. 19-51200 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases. (awd) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration (awd) |
|
17 | 17
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/17/2019 3:27:34 PM ]. File Size [ 7116 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:29:39 ]. (admin) |
|
16 | 16
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/17/2019 1:00:59 PM ]. File Size [ 10750 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:44:48 ]. (admin) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Patricia K. Burgess . (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Order Designating Individual Responsible to Perform Duties of the Debtor-in-Possession . (awd) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Chapter 11 Operating Order. (awd) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Order to File Schedules A,B,D-H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individuals Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy and Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. (awd) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 07/02 12:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Removal 19-5013 . Receipt Number 9907993, Fee Amount 350.00. (nak) |
||
Sunday, June 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion for Joint Administration of Cambrian Holding Company, Inc.; Apex Energy, Inc.; Bear Branch Coal LLC; C.W. Augering, Inc.; Cambrian Coal LLC; Clintwood Elkhorn Mining LLC; Gatliff Coal LLC; Marshall Resources, Inc.; Perry County Coal LLC; Pike-Letcher Land LLC ; PLM Holding Company LLC; Premier Elkhorn Coal LLC; Raven Rock Development LLC; Ray Coal LLC; Rich Mountain Coal LLC; S. T. & T. Leasing, Inc.; Shelby Resources, LLC; T.C. Leasing, Inc.; Whitaker Coal LLC, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rachelle C. Dodson Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Dodson, Rachelle) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Adam R. Kegley . (Kegley, Adam) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Corporate Resolution, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Supplemental Document Verification of Mailing List Matrix , filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. Corporate Affilates added to case:, J. Mark Campbell. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Equity Security Holders , filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Supplemental Document Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , filed by Shelby Resources, LLC . (Kegley, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
![]() 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1717 Filed by Shelby Resources, LLC. (Kegley, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 06/16 11:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-51199 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 9906864, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |