Cambrian Coal LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:19-bk-51213 |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Cambrian Coal LLC
Frost Brown Todd LLC Lexington Financial Center 250 West Main Street, Suite 2800
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
1. | Cambrian Coal files voluntary petitions for relief under Chapter 11 (worldcoal.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/26/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago |
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2023. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 05/03 1:32 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 23-5039 . Receipt Number 400005, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
utility
Update Claim Status
Thu 01/19 11:00 AM
Update Status of Claim 6 (alf) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Notice of Filing of of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim Filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Pavey, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for case number 19-51213 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2021. (Kennedy, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Certificate of Service . (Allen, William) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Order GRANTING Motion To Withdraw As Attorney . Involvement of Attorney William W Allen terminated. (alf) |
|
Thursday, July 29, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by William W Allen. Last day to file objections: 8/12/2021 . (Allen, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 05/26 7:38 AM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal Filing Fee in Adversary 19-5021 Receipt Number A10788963, Fee Amount 298.00, (tgw) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Thu 02/18 11:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Appeal (Doc #1532) filed in Lead Case Number 19-51200 Receipt Number 312662, Fee Amount 298.00. [Appeal applies to Debtors 19-51200 19-51205 19-51209 19-51211 19-51213 , and 19-51217 (tgw) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 09/30 10:12 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5021 . Receipt Number 311524, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 09/30 10:43 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5022 . Receipt Number 311525, Fee Amount 350.00. (tgw) |
||
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 10/02 4:15 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief from Stay (Doc #532) filed in Lead Case Number 19-51200 Receipt Number 10056197, Fee Amount 181.00. [Motion applies to this Debtor 19-51213 only] (tgw) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 10/02 4:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief from Stay (Doc #531) filed in Lead Case Number 19-51200 Receipt Number 10056021, Fee Amount 181.00. [Motion applies to Debtors 19-51213 , 19-51216 and 19-51210 (tgw) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John T. Hamilton Filed by on behalf of Caudill Seed and Warehouse Co., Inc.. (Hamilton, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Correspondence: Response to correspondence received from Sandy Runyon on August 9, 2019. Response mailed to Sandy Runyon, 1227 Biggs Branch Road, Pikeville, KY 41501 on August 14, 2019. (alf) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Correspondence received from Sandy Runyon re: property on Biggs Branch, Pikeville, KY. (alf) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Schedule(s) filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,, filed by Cambrian Coal LLC, Statement of Financial Affairs, filed by Cambrian Coal LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules , filed by Cambrian Coal LLC, Disclosure of Fees filed by Patricia K. Burgess Attorney for Debtor. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 07/29 4:54 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee 19-5014 . Receipt Number 311315, Fee Amount 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keith J Larson Filed by on behalf of Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd.. (Larson, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 07/02 1:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Removal 19-5013 . Receipt Number 311243, Fee Amount 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/19/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Martin B. Tucker Filed by on behalf of Community Trust Bank, Inc.. (Tucker, Martin) |
|
18 | 18
court
Entry
Tue 06/18 1:39 PM
Entry - An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced by Cambrian Holding Company, Inc., Cambrian Coal LLC, Apex Energy, Inc., C.W. Augering, Inc., Marshall Resources, Inc., PLM Holding Company LLC, Bear Branch Coal LLC, Clintwood Elkhorn Mining LLC, Gatliff Coal LLC, Perry County Coal LLC, Ray Coal LLC, Whitaker Coal LLC, Pike-Letcher Land LLC, Premier Elkhorn Coal LLC, Raven Rock Development LLC, Rich Mountain Coal LLC, S. T. & T. Leasing, Inc. and Shelby Resources, LLC. The docket in Case No. 19-51200 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases. (awd) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration (awd) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Order Designating Individual Responsible to Perform Duties of the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession . (awd) |
|
15 | 15
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/17/2019 3:27:34 PM ]. File Size [ 7116 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:29:39 ]. (admin) |
|
14 | 14
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/17/2019 1:00:59 PM ]. File Size [ 10750 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:44:48 ]. (admin) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Patricia K. Burgess . (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by JOHN Thomas HAMILTON Filed by on behalf of Eddie John Coleman. (HAMILTON, JOHN) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Chapter 11 Operating Order. (awd) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order to File Schedules A,B,D-H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individuals Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy and Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. (awd) |
|
Sunday, June 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rachelle C. Dodson Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Dodson, Rachelle) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion for Joint Administration of Cambrian Holding Company, Inc.; Apex Energy, Inc.; Bear Branch Coal LLC; C.W. Augering, Inc.; Cambrian Coal LLC; Clintwood Elkhorn Mining LLC; Gatliff Coal LLC; Marshall Resources, Inc.; Perry County Coal LLC; Pike-Letcher Land LLC ; PLM Holding Company LLC; Premier Elkhorn Coal LLC; Raven Rock Development LLC; Ray Coal LLC; Rich Mountain Coal LLC; S. T. & T. Leasing, Inc.; Shelby Resources, LLC; T.C. Leasing, Inc.; Whitaker Coal LLC, filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Resolution, filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Supplemental Document Verification of Mailing List Matrix , filed by Cambrian Coal LLC . (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. Corporate parents added to case:Cambrian Holding Company, Inc... (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Equity Security Holders , filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
2 | 2
![]() 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1717 Filed by Cambrian Coal LLC. (Burgess, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 06/16 6:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-51213 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 9907083, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |