Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:19-bk-23185 |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2019 |
Dismissed: | Dec 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.
1270 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1700 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
1. | AMCA Files Chapter 11 After Data Breach Impacting Quest, LabCorp (healthitsecurity.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/18/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 06/21 10:51 AM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi) |