BLANCHETTE v. DEVOS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01775 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2019 3:38 AM EST |
Defendant
ELISABETH DEVOS
in her official capacity as Secretary of Education 400 Maryland Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 Maryland Avenue, SW
Washington, D.C., DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMARA BLANCHETTE
|
Represented By
|
1. | Betsy DeVos faces new lawsuit over student debt forgiveness (cnn.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/25/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by TAMARA BLANCHETTE. (Rothschild, Eric) |
|
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by MIGUEL CARDONA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 02/28 9:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of32 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall remain held in abeyance until April 29, 2022. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before April 29, 2022, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the proceedings and negotiations and the parties' views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/28/2022. (lcrc3) |
||
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 12/29 7:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of31 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall remain held in abeyance until February 28, 2022. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before February 28, 2022, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the proceedings and negotiations and the parties' views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/29/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
Tuesday, December 28, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by MIGUEL CARDONA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TAMARA BLANCHETTE. Attorney Robyn K. Bitner terminated. (Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Saturday, October 30, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Sat 10/30 2:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of29 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall remain held in abeyance until December 28, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before December 28, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the proceedings and negotiations and the parties' views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/30/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by TAMARA BLANCHETTE. (Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Monday, August 30, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 08/30 1:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of28 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall remain held in abeyance until October 29, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 29, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the proceedings and negotiations and the parties' views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Attorney Kevin P. Hancock terminated. (Hancock, Kevin) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance
Fri 07/02 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion to Hold in Abeyance. Upon consideration of25 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall be held in abeyance until August 30, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before August 30, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the proceedings and negotiations and the parties' views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/2/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT Requesting that All Deadlines Be Held in Abeyance for an Additional 60 Days by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
motion
Hold in Abeyance
Thu 07/01 6:29 PM
MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (See Docket Entry25 to view document). (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT Requesting that All Deadlines Be Held in Abeyance for an Additional 90 Days by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Hancock, Kevin) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 04/02 3:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of24 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that that all deadlines in this case, including Defendants' November 4, 2020 deadline to respond to20 Plaintiffs' amended complaint, shall be held in abeyance until July 1, 2021, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court on their views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/2/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT Requesting that All Deadlines Be Held in Abeyance for an Additional 60 Days by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Hancock, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
.Order
Mon 02/01 4:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of23 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case, including Defendants' November 4, 2020 deadline to respond to20 Plaintiffs' amended complaint, shall be held in abeyance until April 2, 2021, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court on their views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/1/2021. (lcrc3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 02/01 4:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/2/2021 (tj) |
||
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 12/04 4:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/1/2021. (tj) |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 12/03 5:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of22 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case, including Defendants' November 4, 2020 deadline to respond to20 Plaintiffs' amended complaint, shall be held in abeyance until February 1, 2021, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court on their views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/3/2020. (lcrc3) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT Requesting that All Deadlines Be Held in Abeyance for an Additional 60 Days by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Hancock, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance
Mon 11/02 8:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting21 Motion to Hold in Abeyance. It is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines in this case, including Defendants' November 4, 2020 deadline to respond to20 Plaintiffs' amended complaint, shall be held in abeyance for 30 days from the date of this Minute Order, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court on their views on whether the abeyance should continue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/2/2020. (lcrc3) |
||
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Consent MOTION to Hold in Abeyance All Deadlines in this Case for 30 Days by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION(Hancock, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TAMARA BLANCHETTE.(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION granting10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot12 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/22/2020. (lcrc3) |
|
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot12 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/22/2020. (lcrc3) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() RESPONSE re16 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by TAMARA BLANCHETTE (Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by TAMARA BLANCHETTE(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Merritt, R.) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Memorandum in opposition to re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TAMARA BLANCHETTE.(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by TAMARA BLANCHETTE(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/27 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to8 Plaintiff's motion for class certification or, in the alternative, class discovery, is stayed until 14 days after any ruling by this Court on10 Defendants' motion to dismiss that does not wholly grant that motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 27, 2019. (lcrc3) |
||
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION(Merritt, R.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION(Merritt, R.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by R. Charlie Merritt on behalf of All Defendants (Merritt, R.) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Certify Class or, in the Alternative , MOTION for Discovery by TAMARA BLANCHETTE(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Elson on behalf of TAMARA BLANCHETTE (Elson, Alexander) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Rothschild on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rothschild, Eric) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Fri 08/16 3:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until September 19, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's opposition to that motion is due by October 24, 2019, and Defendants' reply in support of that motion is due by November 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 16, 2019. (lcrc3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/16 4:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/19/2019; Responses due by 10/24/2019; Replies due by 11/14/2019. (tj) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set a Briefing Schedule by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION(Bloom, Karen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELISABETH DEVOS served on 6/24/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 6/24/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2019.)(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ERRATA by TAMARA BLANCHETTE.(Bitner, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(zef, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195960) filed by TAMARA BLANCHETTE.(Bitner, Robyn) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (zef, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/18 2:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) |